Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 04/18/2021 at 10:05:11 (UTC).

AAA FULL TRANSPORTATION INC AN ARIZONA CORPORATION VS LORENZO WHITTAKER

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 AAA FULL TRANSPORTATION INC AN ARIZONA CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against LORENZO WHITTAKER. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5956

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AAA FULL TRANSPORTATION INC AN ARIZONA CORPORATION

AAA FULL TRANSPORTATION INC

Defendant

LORENZO WHITTAKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Byrl Lane

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Re-Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less