This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 02/18/2022 at 13:27:46 (UTC).

TIPTON, MARY LOU -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/16/1996 TIPTON, MARY LOU -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, JOHN R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6-79

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/1996

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

SCOTT, JOHN R

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

ROBERTSON, BRENDA KAY

TIPTON, MARY LOU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WILLIAMS, RALPH CAVIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2000
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION; Entry: Order for Final Distribution & Discharge BOOK: 2000 PAGE: 0435

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2000
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2000
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB; Entry: Petition for Final Distribution & Discharge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1996
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Entry: Waiver of Notice and Entry of Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1996
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Entry: Waiver of Land Sale (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1996
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Entry: Petition for Partial Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1996
  • DocketDescription: ORDER DISTRIBUTION; Entry: Order for Partial Distribution BOOK: 96 PAGE: 2557

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/1996
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Entry: Certificate of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING; Entry: Waiver of Notice, Entry, Inventory, & Acctg (6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF WILL; Entry: Proof of Holographic Will (3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DocketDescription: PET PROBATE WILL-APPT PERS REP; Entry: Petition to Probate Will & Appoint Personal Repres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Entry: Order Probating Will and Appoint Administrator BOOK: 96 PAGE: 0452

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Entry: Letters Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Entry: Holographic Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: STYLE: TIPTON, MARY LOU TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less