This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 07/07/2021 at 22:33:00 (UTC).

SUSAN EASTON V GARY GIBSON -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 11/03/1995 SUSAN EASTON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARY GIBSON -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1207

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/1995

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EASTON, SUSAN

Defendant

GIBSON, GARY

 

Court Documents

LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

07/10/2018: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

07/10/2018: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

07/10/2018: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

07/10/2018: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

07/10/2018: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

07/10/2018: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/1999
  • DocketDescription: MOD OTHER DECREE/DISPOSITION; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/1998
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/1998
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/1998
  • DocketDescription: MOF REOPEN CUSTODY; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/1996
  • DocketDescription: MOD OTHER DECREE OR JUDGMENT; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/1996
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/1996
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/1996
  • DocketDescription: MOF REOPEN CUSTODY; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/1996
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/1995
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/1995
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/1995
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less