This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 01/19/2022 at 15:00:08 (UTC).

SORRELS V SORRELS -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/08/1996 SORRELS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SORRELS -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CANDICE SETTLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-249

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/1996

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

CANDICE SETTLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SORRELS, HARLEY WAYNE

Defendant

SORRELS, BETTY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SORRELS, BETTY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 WRIT OF ASSISTANCE RETURNED SERVED TO BETTY SORRELS 10-2-96BY DEPUTYSHERIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SORRELS, BETTY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 DECREE FILED. PLTF GRANTED DIVORCE ON GROUNDS OF G&PI. CUSTODY TO PLTFNO VISITATION FOR DEFT. NO C/S ORDERED. NO PROPERTY FOR THECOURT TODIVIDE.WRIT OF ASSISTANCE FILED. CHY 96/5193.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/1996
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SORRELS, BETTY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 SUBPOENA ISSUED TO MIKE HOLT, SENT TO ATTY FOR SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SORRELS, BETTY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 ORDER FILED. DEFT IS TO ANSWER INTERR & REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ON ORBEFORE 10-1-96. UPON FAILURE TO DO SO, COUNTERCLAIM OF DEFTWILL BEDISMISSED W/OUT PREJUDICE. CHY 96/4706.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SORRELS, BETTY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY PLT/MICHAEL BRADLEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SORRELS, BETTY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 ORDER FILED. JUDY DEASON ALLOWD TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY FOR DEFT. CHY 96/4262.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SORRELS, BETTY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 LETTER FROM B REED TO COUNSEL RE: HEARING SET 10-1-96 @ 1:30PM @COURT PLAZA BLDG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SORRELS, BETTY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW FILED BY JUDITH DEASON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SORRELS, BETTY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO THE DEFT FILED BY MICHAEL BRADLEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SORRELS, BETTY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 ANSWER & COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY JUDY DEASON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SORRELS, BETTY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 COMPLAINT FILED BY MICHAEL BRADLEY. SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFT,SENT TOATTY FOR SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/1996
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/1996
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/1996
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less