This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 09:28:36 (UTC).

PRESTON A RUDISILL V SANDRA G. RUDISILL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/01/1997 PRESTON A RUDISILL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANDRA G RUDISILL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMISON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-872

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

JAMISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUDISILL, PRESTON A

Defendant

RUDISILL, SANDRA G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BYNUM JR , FRANK WILSON

NORTON, CRARY MAC

Defendant Attorney

STONE, THOMAS SHERMAN

 

Court Documents

AOC COVERSHEET REOPEN DOM REL

05/20/2014: AOC COVERSHEET REOPEN DOM REL

MOTION COMPEL

03/17/2015: MOTION COMPEL

ORDER RECUSAL

03/17/2015: ORDER RECUSAL

ORDER OTHER

03/18/2015: ORDER OTHER

RESPONSE TO MOTION

03/20/2015: RESPONSE TO MOTION

MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

03/27/2015: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

ORDER OTHER

04/07/2015: ORDER OTHER

MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

04/23/2015: MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

MOTION DISMISS

07/08/2015: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

07/08/2015: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; Entry: F. WILSON BYNUM, JR., WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. C.MAC NORTON ENTERS HIS APPEARANCE AS ATTORNEY FILED, 3/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: ORDER ON DE'FS MOTION TO COMPEL FILED, 3/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER RECUSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET REOPEN DOM REL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CITATION/CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketDescription: MOF REOPEN CONTEMPT DOM REL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/1997
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/1997
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less