This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 07:48:27 (UTC).

NEIMAN, DELORA -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 03/24/1997 NEIMAN, DELORA -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDSAY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-145

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

LINDSAY

 

Party Details

Decedent

NEIMAN, DELORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SMITH JR , TRUMAN H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2002
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: RECEIPTS(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2002
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2002
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2002
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2002
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: LETTER TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2002
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER APPROVING FINAL DIST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2002
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2002
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: LETTER FROM JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2000
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: LETTER FROM ATTY TO JUDGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: WAIVERS(3), WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING(3),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER PROBATING, ACCEPTANCE, LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: DESIGNATION OF AGENT, DISCLAIMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: RESIGNATION AS EXECUTRIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION, WILL, PROOF, WAIVERS (6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: STYLE: NEIMAN, DELORA TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less