This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 12/24/2021 at 09:39:01 (UTC).

NEAL, LELA P. -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 08/01/1995 NEAL, LELA P -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CANDICE SETTLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-129

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/1995

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

CANDICE SETTLE

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

GRASLIE, CLARA B. NEAL

NEAL, CLAUDE C.

COFFEY, BONNIE M. NEAL

NEAL, EARL L.

NEAL, JAMES H.

NEAL, CLYDE A.

DOBBS, FRANCIS J.

GAGE, SYBLE I. NEAL

Decedent

NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GANT, PAUL DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/1995
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTEE-CLAUDE C. NEARL-CLARA B. NEAL GRASLIEBONNIE M. NEAL COFFEY-JAMES H. NEAL-SYBLE I. NEAL GAGE-CLYDE A. NEAL-EARL L. NEAL-FRANCIS J. NEAL DOBBS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info ORDER AUTHORIZING FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE ASSETS.MOTION TO WITHDRAW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info REPORT OF SALE.ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL ESTATE.{NOTICE OF HEARING TO HEIRS.PROOF OF PUBLICATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL ESTATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info PETITION FOR AUTHORITY TO SELL REAL ESTATE.APPRAISEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info PROOF OF PUBLICATION. 8-12-1995 AND 8-16-1995.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info ORDER CONFIRMING INVENTORY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info WAIVER OF NOTICE AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CLARA B NEAL GRASLIE-JAMES H NEAL-BONNIE M. NEAL COFFEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info COPY OF NOTICEWAIVER OF NOTICE AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CLAUDE C. NEAL-SYBLE I. NEAL GAGE-CLYDE A NEAL-EARL L NEAL-FRANCIS J. NEAL DOBBS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: NEAL, LELA P. DECEASED; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT JUDGE: 1 PARTY TYPE: IP PARTY NUM: 1 EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/12/1998 RESULT CODE1: info PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONALREPRESENTATIVE.LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF LELA P. NEAL.PROOF OF WILL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/1995
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: STYLE: NEAL, LELA P. TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less