This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 01/11/2022 at 15:14:36 (UTC).

KIMBERLY LAYMON V LUKE SCOTT LAYMON -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 10/14/1997 KIMBERLY LAYMON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LUKE SCOTT LAYMON -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAWSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1092

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

CLAWSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAYMON, KIMBERLY

Defendant

LAYMON, LUKE SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIMBAUGH, JEANETTE STEPHENS

Defendant Attorney

MCNUTT, MONA J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2002
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:ORDER AND AGREED ORDER (CUSTODY CHILD SUPPORT INS.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2002
  • DocketDescription: MOD OTHER DECREE OR JUDGMENT; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2002
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:RESPONSE TO COUNTER PETITION FOR CHANGE OF CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2002
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2002
  • DocketDescription: COUNTERCLAIM; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:COUNTER PETITION FOR CHANGE OF CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2002
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:LETTER TO (SCOTT LAYMON FROM MONA J. MCNUTT CONCERNING TRIAL/HEARING DATE ON 4-9-02 @ 9)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2002
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:PROOF OF SERVICE (JARED HARGROVE 2/16/02)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2002
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:PETITION FOR CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2001
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:RESPONSE TO AMENDED PETITION FOR MODIFICATION AND FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2001
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL HELD; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:TRIAL/HEARING SETTING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2000
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:LETTER OF TRANSFER FROM 1ST TO 3RD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2000
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:MOTION FOR CHANGE OF CUSTODY AND TO SET CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2000
  • DocketDescription: MOD OTHER DECREE OR JUDGMENT; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2000
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2000
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2000
  • DocketDescription: MOF REOPEN CONTEMPT DOM REL; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/1997
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/1997
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less