This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 00:04:53 (UTC).

JEANA ERBACH V ADAM ERBACH -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/18/1996 JEANA ERBACH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ADAM ERBACH -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAWSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-651

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/1996

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

CLAWSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERBACH, JEANA

Defendant

ERBACH, ADAM

 

Court Documents

FILING - OTHER

09/08/2014: FILING - OTHER

FILING - OTHER

09/08/2014: FILING - OTHER

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: CHILD TURNED 18 OR GRADUATED HIGH SCHOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: VERIFY THAT CHILD TURNED 18 OR GRADUATED HIGH SCHOOL AND THAT NO FURTHER CURRENT CHILD SUPPORT IS DUE AFTER 7/23/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2008
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:LETTER (CLERK TO CERIDIAN CORP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2008
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (SERVED-ADAM ERBACH 5/23/08)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2008
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE (5/30/08)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2008
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2008
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:ADMINISTRATIVE FEE LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2008
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:ORDER (CHILD SUPPORT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2007
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2002
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:SUMMONS RETURNED (ADAM ERBACH SERVED 8-26-02)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2002
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:SUMMONS ISSUED (ADAM ERBACH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2002
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:MOTION TO CHANGE CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2002
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2002
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2002
  • DocketDescription: MOF REOPEN CUSTODY; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/1996
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/1996
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/1996
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/1996
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less