This case was last updated from Van Buren County Courts on 07/18/2021 at 23:24:53 (UTC).

JAMES KAY V SHONDA KAY -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/10/1997 JAMES KAY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHONDA KAY -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Van Buren County Courts, Van Buren County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAWSON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****97-8

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/1997

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Van Buren, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

CLAWSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAY, JAMES

Defendant

KAY, SHONDA

 

Court Documents

AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

01/10/1997: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

01/10/1997: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

WAIVER

01/17/1997: WAIVER

DEPOSITION

01/24/1997: DEPOSITION

DEPOSITION

01/24/1997: DEPOSITION

DECREE OF DIVORCE

02/24/1997: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Entry: DR-1997-008 - DR - DECR - DECREE OF DIVORCE - BOOK 42 PAGE 278 - 843092 - 19970224

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Entry: DEPOSITION OF WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Entry: DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Entry: WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE AND APPEARANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED; Entry: DIVORCE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Entry: CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/1997
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/1997
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less