This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 04/27/2022 at 11:49:50 (UTC).

HALL, WILLIAM E.

Case Summary

On 03/03/1997 HALL, WILLIAM E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDSAY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-108

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

LINDSAY

 

Party Details

Decedent

HALL, WILLIAM E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DAVIS, BOYCE R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: FAMILY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: FINAL DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: DATE FOR APPROVAL OF CLAIM, ADM COSTS &

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: LETTER FROM ATTY BOYCE DAVIS FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ACCEPTANCE, LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: -HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: MOTION, ORDER REMOVING CO-ADM SUBJECT TO

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER FOR PARTIAL DIST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER APPROVING SALE OF PERS. PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: INVENTORY, PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER APPT SUCCESSOR CO ADMINSTRATRIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: CONSENT TO W/D AS CO-ADM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PROOFOF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER APPT ADM., ACCEPTANCE (2), LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION, WAIVERS (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: STYLE: HALL, WILLIAM E. TRLDISP:

    Read MoreRead Less