This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 04/28/2022 at 15:40:10 (UTC).

FANTINEL, JOSEPHINE T. -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/03/1997 FANTINEL, JOSEPHINE T -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7-53

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

BRYAN

 

Party Details

Decedent

FANTINEL, JOSEPHINE TERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LORENZO, THELMA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/1998
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER APPROVING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/1998
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: RECEIPT, REPORT OF DIST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/1998
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/1998
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: RECEIPTS (6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/1998
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION, ORDER FOR FINAL DIST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/1998
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/1998
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER TO PAY INCOME TAXES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1998
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/1998
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: WAIVER, RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/1998
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING(8), RECEIPTS(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION, ORDER FOR PARTIAL DIST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: WAIVERS (9)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER PROBATING, ACCEPTANCE, LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION, WILL, PROOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: STYLE: FANTINEL, JOSEPHINE T. TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less