This case was last updated from Van Buren County Courts on 08/05/2021 at 22:31:54 (UTC).

EULAS A CROCKER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/17/1997 EULAS A CROCKER -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Van Buren County Courts, Van Buren County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLARK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7-43

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/1997

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Van Buren, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

CLARK

 

Party Details

Decedent

CROCKER, EULAS A

 

Court Documents

ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

03/10/1998: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

03/10/1998: ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

AMENDED PETITION

03/06/1998: AMENDED PETITION

WAIVER

03/06/1998: WAIVER

WAIVER

03/05/1998: WAIVER

REPORT OF SALE

02/25/1998: REPORT OF SALE

PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

02/25/1998: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

02/04/1998: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

PETITION

02/02/1998: PETITION

REPORT OF SALE

11/12/1997: REPORT OF SALE

AFFIDAVIT FILED

08/29/1997: AFFIDAVIT FILED

INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

08/22/1997: INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

LETTER

08/11/1997: LETTER

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

07/29/1997: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

07/29/1997: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

07/29/1997: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

NOTICE - OTHER

07/29/1997: NOTICE - OTHER

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

07/29/1997: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/1998
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSFER; Entry: ORDER OF TRANSFER T-110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE; Entry: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND APPROVING FIDUCIARY'S DEED - S - 499

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION; Entry: ORDER WAIVING ACCOUNTING, AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF FEES AND COSTS, AUTHORIZING FINAL DISTRIBUTION , DISCHARGING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND CLOSING ESTATE - S - 496

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/1998
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED PETITION; Entry: "AMENDED" PETITION FOR WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING , AUTHORITY TO PAY FEES AND COSTS , MAKE FINAL DISTRIBUTION , AND FOR DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Entry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND CONSENT TO FINAL DISTRIBUTION X 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Entry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND CONSENT TO FINAL DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REPORT OF SALE; Entry: REPORT OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB; Entry: PETITION FOR WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, AUTHORITY TO PAY FEES AND COSTS, MAKE FINAL DISTRIBUTION, AND FOR DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Entry: ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY BOOK S PAGE 431

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Entry: LETTERS TESTAMENTAEY BOOK 6 PAGE 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT; Entry: ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Entry: PROBATE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Entry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BOOK S PAGE 153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Entry: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET PROBATE WILL-APPT PERS REP; Entry: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER DELIVERY; Entry: ORDER TO DELIVER WILL TO ATTORNEYS BOOK S PAGE 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Entry: PETITION FOR ORDER TO DELIVER WILL TO ATTORNEYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Entry: COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: STYLE: EULAS A. CROCKER TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less