This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 04/02/2022 at 10:19:25 (UTC).

EUBANKS, VIOLA JUNE -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 03/17/1995 EUBANKS, VIOLA JUNE -BENCH TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDSAY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-110

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/1995

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

LINDSAY

 

Party Details

Decedent

EUBANKS, VIOLA JUNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

EVANS JR , JAMES EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/1997
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER DISMISSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/1996
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: LETTER FROM JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER TO PAY CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER APPROVING SALE OF PERSONALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: REPORT OF SALE, ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER TO SELL REAL ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: LETTERS FROM ATTY (3), PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: CLAIM (LAFERN LINN $48531.09)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: INVENTORY, PETITION, REPORT OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: APPRAISEMENT, NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PUBLICATION, COPY OF ATTY'S LETTER(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: SALE OF PERSONAL PROPERTY, PROOF OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION, ORDER DIRECTING & AUTHORIZING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: BOND, LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: QUALIF AFFIDAVIT, ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: ORDER APPT ADM., DEATH CERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/1995
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: STYLE: EUBANKS, VIOLA JUNE TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less