This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 01/07/2022 at 05:19:32 (UTC).

CHRIS TARPLEY V LADINA TARPLEY -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/30/1997 CHRIS TARPLEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LADINA TARPLEY -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WEAVER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1042

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

WEAVER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TARPLEY, CHRIS

Defendant

TARPLEY, LADINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SPRADLIN, LARRY LEISTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2006
  • DocketDescription: CONTEMPT ORDER/CITATION; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:CONTEMPT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2006
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:LETTER STATING HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 5-10-06 HAS BEEN CONTINUED TO 7-12-06 8:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2006
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR CITATION (CHRIS TARPLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2006
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (CHRIS TARPLEY SERVED 04-15-06)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2006
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE (5/10/06)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2006
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:ORDER GRANTING INTERVENTION (OCSE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:MOTION FOR CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:MOTION TO INTERVENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2006
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:NOTIFICATION OF ASSIGNMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2006
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:REQUEST FOR COURT ORDERS/PAY RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2002
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:SUMMONS ISSUED (LADIND TARPLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2002
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:PETITION TO INCREASE CHILD SUPPORT AND PETITION FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2002
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2002
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2002
  • DocketDescription: MOF REOPEN CUSTODY; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2001
  • DocketDescription: SUBPOENA REQUESTED; Entry: LEGACY DOCKET:SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED (AM TRAM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/1998
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1997
  • DocketDescription: PUB LAW 104-193 INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1997
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1997
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: TRLDISP: B

    Read MoreRead Less