This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 07/16/2021 at 19:15:16 (UTC).

CENTRAL ARKANSAS PHYSICAL V EDWARD R MUNNERLYN

Case Summary

On 10/14/1996 CENTRAL ARKANSAS PHYSICAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EDWARD R MUNNERLYN. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. PATRICIA ANN JAMES. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1955

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/1996

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

HON. PATRICIA ANN JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTRAL ARKANSAS PHYSICALTHERAPY

Defendant

MUNNERLYN, EDWARD R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUCHAN, CHARLES J

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

11/29/2010: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

INTERROGATORIES

11/29/2010: INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

12/13/2010: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

01/28/2011: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2011: INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

02/16/2011: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

BANKRUPTCY NOTICE FILED

03/01/2011: BANKRUPTCY NOTICE FILED

NOTICE - OTHER

03/04/2011: NOTICE - OTHER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Entry: OF RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • DocketDescription: MOD REMOVED TO BANKRUPTCY; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BANKRUPTCY NOTICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Entry: TO ALLEGATIONS AND INTERROGATORIES REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt 60CI33625.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INTERROGATORIES; Entry: AND ALLEGATIONS REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Entry: GARNISHEE: REGIONS BANK AMOUNT: $8,147.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Entry: TO ALLEGATIONS AND INTERROGATORIES REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt 60CI28501.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INTERROGATORIES; Entry: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2007
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: ORDER OF REVIVOR 2-07-598 JOEL D. BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Entry: PETITION FOR WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS TO REVIVE JUDGMENT: PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/1999
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Entry: GARNISHEE ANSWER FILED SUPERIOR FEDERAL BANK FSB -0-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/1999
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Entry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SUPERIOR FEDERAL BANK ALLEGS AND INTGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/1998
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE DISMISS BANKRUPTCY; Entry: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/1996
  • DocketDescription: MOD DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/1996
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Entry: DEFAULT JUDGMENT : EDWARD R MUNNERLYN 2819.00 CC 137.50 PRE-JUD INT 333.65 ATTY 280.00 2-96-882

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/1996
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Entry: SUMMONS SERVED : EDWARD R MUNNERLYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/1996
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/1996
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Entry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less