This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 16:46:55 (UTC).

BANK OF MULBERRY VS RICKEY SHORES, ET -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/05/1995 BANK OF MULBERRY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RICKEY SHORES, ET -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******-393

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/1995

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Defendant

B

Defendants

FRICK, EVAN

SHORES, RICKEY

SHORES, ROXANN

MEDLOCK, W J

MEDLOCK, SARAH

B

WINFREY, BOBBY

LEVANDER, JAMES

LEVANDER, MARJORIE

MEDLOCK, JR J E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY CHARLES BAKER.ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED. DISMISSED W/OUT PREJUDICE. CHY 95/6085.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/1995
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE; Entry: TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 LETTER FROM JUDGE KIMBROUGH TO COUNSEL RE: REVEIW OF 11-7-95HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 LETTER TO JAMES & MARJORIE LEVANDER FROM WOK RETD SETTING PRETRIALCONFERENCE FOR 11-7-95 @ 11:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 LETTER FROM JACKIE RAILEY SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR 11-7-95 AT11:00 AM IN CC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 CORRESP FROM J.RAILEY TO COUNSEL RE: HEARING ON 11-07-95 @11:00AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF WARNING ORDER FOR DEFTS .LEVANDER, M.LEVANDER& E.FRICK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 RESPONSE TO FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED BY ERNIE WITT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 AFFIDAVIT OF CHARLES BAKER FOR WARNING ORDER FOR EVAN FRICK,MARJORIELEVANDER & JAMES W. LEVANDER.WARNING ORDER ISSUED FOR ABOVE NAMES SENT TO PRESS ARGUS-COURIER FORPUBLICATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 ANSWER OF DEFT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNA REVENUE SERVICE FILEDBY DEFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 ANSWER OF SEPARATE DEFT, BOBBY WINFREY FILED BY DEFT BOBBY WINFREY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT DFA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/1995
  • DocketDescription: LEGACY DOCKET SHEET; Name: SHORES, RICKEY; Entry: DOCKET SHEET NARRATIVE CONVERT PARTY TYPE: D PARTY NUM: 1 FORCLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED, SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFTS, SENT TOATTYFOR SERVICE, LIS PENDENS FILED BK 95-15240.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/1995
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Entry: STYLE: BANK OF MULBERRY VS RICKEY SHORES, ET TRLDISP: N

    Read MoreRead Less