This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 04:40:13 (UTC).

YANEZ V AYUSO -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 YANEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AYUSO -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, JOHN R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-107

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, JOHN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YANEZ, MIGUEL ANGEL GARCIA

Defendant

AYUSO, RAYMOND PERAZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANUEL, MAISIE KATHERINE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

01/31/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

02/10/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

DECREE OF DIVORCE

02/23/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MANUEL, MAISIE KATHERINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER; Entry: HRG 2/22/2022 @ 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Name: MANUEL, MAISIE KATHERINE; Entry: PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: RAYMOND PERAZA AYUSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 04CI76008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MANUEL, MAISIE KATHERINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MANUEL, MAISIE KATHERINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MANUEL, MAISIE KATHERINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: MANUEL, MAISIE KATHERINE

    Read MoreRead Less