This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 07:36:21 (UTC).

YAMAHA MOTOR FINANCE CORP V JOSEPH STEWART ET AL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 YAMAHA MOTOR FINANCE CORP filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against JOSEPH STEWART -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1751

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAMAHA MOTOR FINANCE CORPORATION, U.S.A.

Defendants

STEWART, JENNIFER D.

MMTR, LLC

STEWART, JOSEPH E.

CLEAR CREEK GOLF CAR & EQUIPMENT COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CASHION, CAMILLE M

MCPHERSON, JAMES MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

HORNSEY JR , JAMES M

FAIR, JACOB POST

BERGER, ERIC

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO NON SUIT

04/06/2022: ORDER TO NON SUIT

MOTION TO NON SUIT

03/29/2022: MOTION TO NON SUIT

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

03/26/2022: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

MOTION ATTORNEY FEES

03/18/2022: MOTION ATTORNEY FEES

ORDER OTHER

02/25/2022: ORDER OTHER

JUDGMENT-CONSENT

02/14/2022: JUDGMENT-CONSENT

ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

12/03/2021: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

MOTION CONTINUANCE

12/02/2021: MOTION CONTINUANCE

ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

11/16/2021: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

ANSWER FILED

11/15/2021: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER FILED

11/15/2021: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER FILED

11/15/2021: ANSWER FILED

ORDER TO NON SUIT

11/09/2021: ORDER TO NON SUIT

MOTION CONTINUANCE

11/08/2021: MOTION CONTINUANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/08/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION TO NON SUIT

11/08/2021: MOTION TO NON SUIT

AGREED ORDER

11/04/2021: AGREED ORDER

MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME

11/02/2021: MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO NON SUIT; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO CLEAR CREEK GOLF CAR & EQUIPMENT COMPANY ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TO NON SUIT; Name: CASHION, CAMILLE M; Entry: MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO ARK. R. CIV. P. 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED; Name: HORNSEY JR , JAMES M; Entry: RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION ATTORNEY FEES; Name: MCPHERSON, JAMES MICHAEL; Entry: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: AGREED ORDER AS TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-CONSENT; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: CONSENT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $2.50 was made on receipt 72CI80906.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER CONTINUING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CONTINUANCE; Name: CASHION, CAMILLE M; Entry: MOTION TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER CONTINUING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED COMPLAINT; Entry: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MCPHERSON, JAMES MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MCPHERSON, JAMES MICHAEL; Entry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: MCPHERSON, JAMES MICHAEL; Entry: JENNIFER D. STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: MCPHERSON, JAMES MICHAEL; Entry: JOSEPH E. STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: MCPHERSON, JAMES MICHAEL; Entry: MMTR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCPHERSON, JAMES MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCPHERSON, JAMES MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCPHERSON, JAMES MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MCPHERSON, JAMES MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less