This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 22:28:55 (UTC).

WINGFIELD & CORRY P.A V S NICOLE TURNER D KNOX

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 WINGFIELD CORRY P A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NICOLE TURNER D KNOX. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is GRUBER, W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-181

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

GRUBER, W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINGFIELD & CORRY, P.A.

Defendants

KNOX, DESHUN

TURNER, STEPHANIE NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORRY, NICOLAS E

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

02/08/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

03/16/2021: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS SERVED

03/23/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

06/23/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Entry: STEPANIE TURNER SERVED ON 3/19/2021 BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Entry: DESHURN KNOX SUB SERVICE TO (GIRLFRIEND) SHALUNDA WHITBY ON 23-FEB-21 BY PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$85.00 was made on receipt 60PC178629.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: WINGFIELD & CORRY, P.A.,; Entry: DEFENDANT #01 STEPHANIE N TURNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: WINGFIELD & CORRY, P.A.,; Entry: DEFENDANT #02 DESHUN KNOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: WINGFIELD & CORRY, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: WINGFIELD & CORRY, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: DATE CLAIM AROSE; Name: WINGFIELD & CORRY, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: WINGFIELD & CORRY, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less