This case was last updated from Van Buren County Courts on 05/04/2022 at 13:18:30 (UTC).

WILMA KAY NEWELL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 WILMA KAY NEWELL -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Van Buren County Courts, Van Buren County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-116

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Van Buren, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CLARK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAVIS, ELLEN D

Decedent

NEWELL, WILMA K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TESTER, KENT

 

Court Documents

FILING - OTHER

01/04/2022: FILING - OTHER

FILING - OTHER

01/04/2022: FILING - OTHER

ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

09/30/2021: ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

FILING - OTHER

09/27/2021: FILING - OTHER

FILING - OTHER

09/27/2021: FILING - OTHER

PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

09/27/2021: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

09/22/2021: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

REPORT OF SALE

09/20/2021: REPORT OF SALE

LETTER

08/24/2021: LETTER

LETTER

08/24/2021: LETTER

ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

08/03/2021: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

PETITION

08/02/2021: PETITION

FILING - OTHER

07/15/2021: FILING - OTHER

AFFIDAVIT FILED

06/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

03/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT COLLECTION SM ESTATE

02/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT COLLECTION SM ESTATE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

02/03/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

LETTER

01/27/2021: LETTER

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: TESTER, KENT; Entry: SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR U.S. NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: TESTER, KENT; Entry: DISPOSITION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: ORDER APPROVING WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, AUTHORITY TO MAKE FINAL DISTRIBUTION FROM ESTATE, APPROVING FEES AND COSTS, APPROVING FUDUCIARY'S DEED, CLOSING ESTATE AND DISCHARGING EXECUTRIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: TESTER, KENT; Entry: SATISFACTION AN RELEASE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: TESTER, KENT; Entry: SATISFACTION OF CLAIM BY DCM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB; Name: TESTER, KENT; Entry: PETITION FOR WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, AUTHORITY TO MAKE FINAL DISTRIBUTION FROM ESTATE, PAY FEES AND COSTS, CLOSE ESTATE AND DISCHARGE EXECUTRIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE AND APROVING DEED

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Entry: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT; Name: TESTER, KENT; Entry: Acceptance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: TESTER, KENT; Entry: Notice of Probate and Notice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: ORDER OPENING THE ESTATE, ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING EXECUTRIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 71CI3135.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: TESTER, KENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CONSENT; Name: TESTER, KENT; Entry: Consent to Open Estate, Admit Will and Appoint Executrix

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: TESTER, KENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: TESTER, KENT; Entry: Petition to Open the Estate, Admit Will to Probate and Appoint Executrix

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: TESTER, KENT; Entry: COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less