This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 02/10/2022 at 07:03:06 (UTC).

WESTLAKE APARTMENTS, PHASE II, LP V JESSICA WOODAR -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 WESTLAKE APARTMENTS, PHASE II, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JESSICA WOODAR -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WEAVER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-166

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WEAVER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE APARTMENTS, PHASE II

Defendant

WOODARD, JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

02/12/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

AFFIDAVIT FILED

02/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION DISMISS

04/07/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

04/07/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 23CI19491.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH; Entry: JESSICA WOODARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less