This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 08/14/2022 at 23:22:25 (UTC).

WANDA E WISDOM -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 WANDA E WISDOM -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County District Court located in Crawford, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCAIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-365

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MCCAIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WISDOM, BOBBY

Not Yet Classified

WISDOM, ANGELA

WISDOM, NATHAN

WISDOM, RICKY LEE

HOLLY, XANDRIA C

WISDOM, LARRY C

HOLLY, KNIGHT XAVIER

Decedent

WISDOM, WANDA P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EDDY, PAUL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

01/13/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

01/13/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

01/05/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

01/05/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

11/16/2021: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

11/16/2021: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

11/16/2021: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

10/25/2021: ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

10/19/2021: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

09/10/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ACCOUNTING BY PERSONAL REP

08/18/2021: ACCOUNTING BY PERSONAL REP

INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

08/12/2021: INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/05/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

01/21/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

01/04/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

12/31/2020: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

CERTIFICATE

12/31/2020: CERTIFICATE

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

12/31/2020: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTEE SIGNED BY KNIGHT HOLLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTEE SIGNED BY NATHAN WISDOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTEE SIGNED BY ANGELA HOLLY WISDOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTEE SIGNED BY XANDRIA HOLLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTEE SIGNED BY RICKY L. WISDOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTEE SIGNED BY LARRY C. WISDOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTEE SIGNED BY BOBBY M. WISDOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO RICKY WISDOM, LARRY WISDOM, NATHAN WISDOM, ANGELA HOLLY-WISDOM, AND KNIGHT HOLLY VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPTS ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBITS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: PROOF OF LEGAL PUBLICATION WITH RUN DATES IN THE ARKANSAS DEMOCRAT GAZZETTE OF JANUARY 10 AND 17. 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: ACCEPTANCE OF APPOINTMENT AS PERSONAL REPRESENATIVE SIGNED BY BOBBY M. WISDOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Entry: CERTIFICATE OF PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING BOBBY M. WISDOM AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF THE DECEDENT AND TO SERVE WITHOUT BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF WANDA EULETA WISDOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET PROBATE WILL-APPT PERS REP; Name: WISDOM, BOBBY; Entry: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY BOBBY WISDOM, SON OF DECEDENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Entry: ATTORNEY OF RECORD, PAUL EDDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less