This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 01/29/2023 at 17:04:29 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC V MCKAY -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCKAY -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2389

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

MCKAY, LEANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOB, MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/15/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/15/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/13/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

12/14/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A; Entry: LEANNA MCKAY 11/4/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 04CI83524.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: LEANNA MCKAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less