This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 03/10/2023 at 12:46:52 (UTC).

VANDERBILT MORTGAGE & FINANCE V B & K GARRISON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 VANDERBILT MORTGAGE FINANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against B K GARRISON -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-432

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANCE INC

Defendants

OCCUPANTS

GARRISON, BRANDON

GARRISON, KATRINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

Defendant Attorney

HARRELSON, STEVEN PATE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/08/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

NOTICE - OTHER

09/08/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

NOTICE - OTHER

09/08/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

NOTICE - OTHER

09/08/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/08/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/08/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/08/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ANSWER FILED

12/06/2022: ANSWER FILED

MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

12/13/2022: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

12/21/2022: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/16/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/16/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION OTHER

02/16/2023: MOTION OTHER

ORDER OTHER

02/24/2023: ORDER OTHER

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: EIGHT SOUTH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER DISMISSING SEPARATE DEFENDANT, CURRENT OCCUPANTS OF 659 MILLER COUNTY 213 FOUKE, AR 71837

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: EIGHT SOUTH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: HARRELSON, STEVEN PATE; Entry: Answer of Separate Defendant Katrina Garrison

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: HARRELSON, STEVEN PATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $172.50 was made on receipt 46CI47950.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: REYNOLDS, EMILY JEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less