This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 15:21:23 (UTC).

THOMAS ALFRED HARMS

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 THOMAS ALFRED HARMS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County District Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCAIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-201

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MCCAIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARMS, TOMMIE

Respondents

CLAYTON, BREANNAH

JENSEN, VIRGINIA

LAWSON, JOHN THOMAS

Decedent

HARMS, THOMAS ALFRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MURDOCH, TIMOTHY WEBB

 

Court Documents

ORDER OTHER

12/28/2022: ORDER OTHER

PETITION

12/27/2022: PETITION

LETTER

12/27/2022: LETTER

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

LETTER

12/07/2022: LETTER

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

LETTER

10/13/2022: LETTER

DEMAND FOR NOTICE

10/13/2022: DEMAND FOR NOTICE

LETTER

10/11/2022: LETTER

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

10/11/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

ORDER OTHER

09/27/2022: ORDER OTHER

PETITION

09/26/2022: PETITION

LETTER

09/20/2022: LETTER

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

09/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

ORDER OTHER

08/26/2022: ORDER OTHER

PETITION

08/25/2022: PETITION

WAIVER

08/23/2022: WAIVER

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

08/18/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER ALLOWING AND AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: MURDOCH, TIMOTHY WEBB; Entry: PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LETTER TO ADMINISTRATOR REGARDING CLAIM WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED HERETO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT TO CLAIM AGAINST THE ESTATE FILED BY ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC, ON BEHALF OF SYNCHRONY BANK - AMAZON STORE CARD IN THE AMOUNT OF $499.56.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LETTER TO ADMINISTRATOR REGARDING CLAIM WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED HERETO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT TO CLAIM AGAINST THE ESTATE FILED BY THE POPE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR IN THE AMOUNT OF $82.32.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LETTER TO MILLARD-HENRY CLINIC REGARDING DEMAND FOR NOTICE WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED HERETO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEMAND FOR NOTICE; Entry: DEMAND FOR NOTICE FILED BY MILLARD-HENRY CLINIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LETTER TO ADMINISTRATOR REGARDING CLAIM WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED HERETO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT TO CLAIM AGAINST THE ESTATE FILED BY PROBATE RECOVERY SYSTEMS, LLC, ON BEHALF OF SAINT MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,685.96.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: MURDOCH, TIMOTHY WEBB; Entry: PETITION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF HEIRS BY WARNING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Entry: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: MURDOCH, TIMOTHY WEBB; Entry: ACCEPTANCE OF APPOINTMENT AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ADMINISTRATOR SIGNED BY TOMMIE HARMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO TOMMIE HARMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: CLAYTON, BREANNAH; Entry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO BREANNAH CLAYTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: JENSEN, VIRGINIA; Entry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO VIRGINIA JENSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: MURDOCH, TIMOTHY WEBB; Entry: DEATH CERTIFICATE OF THE DECEDENT MARKED HERETO AS EXHIBIT "A"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET APPT ADMINISTRATOR/TRIX; Name: HARMS, TOMMIE; Entry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF THOMAS ALFRED HARMS, FILED BY TOMMIE HARMS, DAUGHTER OF THE DECEDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: MURDOCH, TIMOTHY WEBB; Entry: ATTORNEY OF RECORD: TIMOTHY W. MURDOCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less