This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 05/08/2022 at 05:12:27 (UTC).

TANIA ACEVEDO REYNOSO VS BRANDON HERRERA-CORONADO

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 TANIA ACEVEDO REYNOSO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRANDON HERRERA-CORONADO. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAWSON, CHARLES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****22-6

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CLAWSON, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACEDVEDO REYNOSO, TANIA

Defendant

HERRERA-CORONADO, BRANDON

 

Court Documents

SC COMPLAINT FILED $65

01/21/2022: SC COMPLAINT FILED $65

AFFIDAVIT FILED

01/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SERVICE (IN STATE)

01/25/2022: SERVICE (IN STATE)

ANSWER DENYING CLAIM

02/15/2022: ANSWER DENYING CLAIM

JUDGMENT-ON THE MERITS

03/11/2022: JUDGMENT-ON THE MERITS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-ON THE MERITS; Name: ACEDVEDO REYNOSO, TANIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER DENYING CLAIM; Name: HERRERA-CORONADO, BRANDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SERVICE (IN STATE); Name: HERRERA-CORONADO, BRANDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$115.00 was made on receipt 23CW72551.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: ACEDVEDO REYNOSO, TANIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - SHERIFF; Name: ACEDVEDO REYNOSO, TANIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SC COMPLAINT FILED $65; Name: ACEDVEDO REYNOSO, TANIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: DATE CLAIM AROSE; Name: HERRERA-CORONADO, BRANDON

    Read MoreRead Less