This case was last updated from Craighead County Courts on 05/11/2022 at 09:30:17 (UTC).

STEPHEN PAGAN V JEREMY DYE -JURY TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 STEPHEN PAGAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEREMY DYE -JURY TRIAL. This case was filed in Craighead County Courts, Craighead County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LUSBY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********-534

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Craighead, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LUSBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAGAN, STEPHEN O

Defendant

DYE, JEREMY WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCDANIEL, BOBBY R

PHILLIPS, JORDAN SHELBY

Defendant Attorney

HURST JR , HARRY S

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

05/27/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

05/28/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

RETURN OF SERVICE

06/22/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

08/13/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

08/31/2021: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

09/02/2021: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

ANSWER FILED

11/03/2021: ANSWER FILED

FILING - OTHER

11/04/2021: FILING - OTHER

FILING - OTHER

11/05/2021: FILING - OTHER

MOTION DISMISS

03/31/2022: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

04/06/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Name: PAGAN, STEPHEN O; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: HURST JR , HARRY S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 2ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: HURST JR , HARRY S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: HURST JR , HARRY S; Entry: Certificate of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: HURST JR , HARRY S; Entry: Certificate of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: HURST JR , HARRY S; Entry: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: 2ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: PHILLIPS, JORDAN SHELBY; Entry: Motion for Extension of Time for Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: MCDANIEL, BOBBY R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: MCDANIEL, BOBBY R; Entry: Non service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 16ZS13720.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: PAGAN, STEPHEN O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCDANIEL, BOBBY R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MCDANIEL, BOBBY R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MCDANIEL, BOBBY R

    Read MoreRead Less