This case was last updated from Saline County Courts on 06/24/2022 at 19:30:28 (UTC).

STEPHANIE STEPHENS V AUSTIN BRADY -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 STEPHANIE STEPHENS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AUSTIN BRADY -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Saline County Courts, Saline County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is Houston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-370

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Saline, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

Houston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHENS, STEPHANIE MARIE

Defendant

BRADY, SEAN AUSTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE ANGEL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

04/25/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

04/25/2022: STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

04/25/2022: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

05/18/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

AFFIDAVIT FILED

05/26/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

DEPOSITION

05/26/2022: DEPOSITION

WAIVER

05/27/2022: WAIVER

DECREE OF DIVORCE

05/27/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Name: STEPHENS, STEPHANIE MARIE; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE ANGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 22ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE ANGEL; Entry: OF SUMMONS, ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER OF CORROBORATION OF GROUNDS FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE ANGEL; Entry: Plaintiff's witness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE ANGEL; Entry: FOR RESIDENCY AND GROUNDS FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Name: CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE ANGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: STEPHENS, STEPHANIE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE ANGEL