This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 15:38:49 (UTC).

STATE OF ARKANSAS V TRACEY STEELE -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 STATE OF ARKANSAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against TRACEY STEELE -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-553

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE OF ARKANSAS

STATE OF ARKANSAS, 26STAR

Defendant

STEELE, TRACEY MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIELS, JARED TRENTON

 

Court Documents

AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

06/15/2021: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

06/15/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

06/16/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS SERVED

09/10/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/12/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

11/15/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

11/15/2021: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Entry: TRACEY STEELE SERVED @ GGDC 9-10-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Name: STEELE, TRACEY MARIE; Entry: TRACEY STEELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED; Entry: IN REM COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less