This case was last updated from Saline County Courts on 05/05/2022 at 11:41:43 (UTC).

STATE OF ARKANSAS V CEIARRA JARRETT -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 STATE OF ARKANSAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against CEIARRA JARRETT -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Saline County Courts, Saline County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is Houston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-650

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Saline, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

Houston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF ARKANSAS

Defendants

JARRETT, CEIARRA K

JARRETT, CIERRA K

JARRETT, CIERRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHOPTAW, DANIEL VINCENT

Defendant Attorney

HICKS, RICKEY H

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

07/28/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

07/29/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

RESPONSE/REPLY

08/03/2021: RESPONSE/REPLY

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

01/21/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME

01/28/2022: MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER MOTION GRANTED

01/28/2022: ORDER MOTION GRANTED

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

02/03/2022: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

02/03/2022: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

02/03/2022: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

02/03/2022: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

AGREED ORDER

02/14/2022: AGREED ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Name: STATE OF ARKANSAS,; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AGREED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED; Name: HICKS, RICKEY H; Entry: RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER MOTION GRANTED; Name: 22ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME; Name: HICKS, RICKEY H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: SHOPTAW, DANIEL VINCENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: HICKS, RICKEY H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Entry: TO PLAINTIFF'S IN REM COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: SHOPTAW, DANIEL VINCENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: STATE OF ARKANSAS,

    Read MoreRead Less