This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 07/30/2021 at 12:29:18 (UTC).

SPRINGDALE RIDGE PROP INVEST V COLTON BURSEE -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 SPRINGDALE RIDGE PROP INVEST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COLTON BURSEE -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2631

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRINGDALE RIDGE PROPERTY

Defendants

BURSEE, ALEXIS NICOLE

ALL OCCUPANTS OF APARTMENT NO. A206

BRASUELL, ALEXIS NICOLE

BURSEE, COLTON RILEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

12/10/2020: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

EXHIBITS

12/10/2020: EXHIBITS

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/10/2020: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/10/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/10/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

01/14/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

SUMMONS SERVED

01/14/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION OTHER

01/18/2021: MOTION OTHER

ORDER TO DISMISS

01/21/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 72CI70720.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: ALEXIS BURSEE ON 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: COLTON BURSEE ON 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: ALEXIS BURSEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: COLTON BURSEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: AFFIDAVIT IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: A & B TO THE COMPLAINT IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: COMPLAINT IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less