This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 06:45:15 (UTC).

SPRINGDALE RIDGE PROP INVE V ANTHONY JORDAN ET AL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 SPRINGDALE RIDGE PROP INVE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANTHONY JORDAN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2443

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRINGDALE RIDGE

Defendants

ALL OCCUPANTS OF APARTMENT NO. F106

JORDAN, ANTHONY A

BIEN, BELIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

10/27/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

EXHIBITS

10/27/2021: EXHIBITS

AFFIDAVIT FILED

10/27/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/27/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/27/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

11/09/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

SUMMONS SERVED

11/09/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION OTHER

11/09/2021: MOTION OTHER

ORDER WRIT

11/09/2021: ORDER WRIT

WRIT OF POSSESSION$

11/10/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION$

WRIT SERVED

11/22/2021: WRIT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $20.00 was made on receipt 72CI80856.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 72CI80230.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT SERVED; Entry: ANTHONY JORDAN AND BEIN BELIK 11/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION$; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER WRIT; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: BELIK BIEN ON 10/29/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: ANTHONY JORDAN ON 10/29/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: BELIK BIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: ANTHONY JORDAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: AFFIDAVIT IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: A & B TO COMPLAINT IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD; Entry: COMPLAINT IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: SIMMONS, DAVID EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less