This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 11/17/2021 at 09:09:11 (UTC).

SPRING LAKE APARTMENTS ETAL V COLE & BLANKENSHIP -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 SPRING LAKE APARTMENTS ETAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COLE BLANKENSHIP -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNHAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-515

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DUNHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRING LAKE APARTMENTS LP

Defendants

COLE, CALLIE

BLANKENSHIP, CASSIDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

12/22/2020: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

NOTICE - OTHER

12/22/2020: NOTICE - OTHER

SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $

12/22/2020: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $

SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $

12/22/2020: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

12/23/2020: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

12/23/2020: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT FILED

MOTION DISMISS

04/28/2021: MOTION DISMISS

JUDGMENT-DISMISS RULE 41

05/11/2021: JUDGMENT-DISMISS RULE 41

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DISMISS RULE 41; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: HENRY, CLIFFORD JOSEPH; Entry: MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Name: COLE, CALLIE; Entry: SERVED BRIDGETTE MAGNESS ON 12-22-20 @ 3:40 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Name: COLE, CALLIE; Entry: SERVED BRIDGETTE MAGNESS ON 12-22-20 @ 3:40 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$170.00 was made on receipt 58CI182.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: ORIGINAL SIGNATURE WITH NO NOTARY SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: COPY SIGNATURE WITH ORIGINAL NOTARY SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Entry: ISSUED TO CASSIDY BLANKENSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Entry: ISSUED TO CALLIE COLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Entry: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Entry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less