This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 01/05/2023 at 16:03:30 (UTC).

SHULER DRILLING COMPANY INC. V CHAD SCOTT, ETAL

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 SHULER DRILLING COMPANY INC filed an Other lawsuit against CHAD SCOTT, ETAL. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGLETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-33

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SINGLETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHULER DRILLING COMPANY INC

Defendant

SCOTT, CHAD JEFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLEGG, CAROLYN JANE

 

Court Documents

REPORT FILED

08/02/2022: REPORT FILED

ORDER OTHER

08/02/2022: ORDER OTHER

JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER

08/02/2022: JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

07/15/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

03/11/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

LETTER

02/28/2022: LETTER

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REPORT FILED; Entry: REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: DECREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LETTER FROM F & G INVESTMENTS LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: GAMMA PHI BETA FOUNDATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: TONY SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: CHARLOTTE A DEATON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: JAMES M DEATON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: CHAD JEFFERY SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: ELIZABETH SCOTT CHADWICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: ROBERT ARLEN SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: SANDRA GAIL STEPHENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FOR WARNING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less