This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 10:57:01 (UTC).

SHIRLEY MAE HOLLIDAY -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 SHIRLEY MAE HOLLIDAY -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judges overseeing this case are HORWART and SMITH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-590

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judges

HORWART

SMITH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOLLIDAY, LARRY

Decedent

HOLLIDAY, SHIRLEY MAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SPENCE, GEORGE RAY

 

Court Documents

ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

01/06/2022: ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

01/03/2022: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION

12/30/2021: REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION

ORDER DISTRIBUTION

12/28/2021: ORDER DISTRIBUTION

EXHIBITS

12/27/2021: EXHIBITS

PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

12/27/2021: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

11/02/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

10/04/2021: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

APPRAISAL

10/01/2021: APPRAISAL

EXHIBITS

09/30/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

09/30/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

09/30/2021: EXHIBITS

PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

09/30/2021: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

ORDER OTHER

06/21/2021: ORDER OTHER

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

06/15/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

ORDER RECUSAL

06/11/2021: ORDER RECUSAL

WAIVER

06/10/2021: WAIVER

WAIVER

06/10/2021: WAIVER

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CLOSING ESTATE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,; Entry: AND APPROVING REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; Entry: RELEASE OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER DISTRIBUTION; Entry: ORDER AUTHORIZING ATTORNEY'S FEE AND DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY; Entry: EXHIBIT A - RECEIPT OF BENTON COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY; Entry: PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEE, FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 04CO7463.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY; Entry: WAIVER OF FORMALITIES AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - CHAD HOLLIDAY, SR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY; Entry: WAIVER OF FORMALITIES AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - COREY H. BOLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY; Entry: WAIVER OF FORMALITIES AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - LUKE ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY; Entry: WAIVER OF FORMALITIES AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - DAVID HOLLIDAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY; Entry: WAIVER OF FORMALITIES AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - KELLY SANDBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY; Entry: WAIVER OF FORMALITIES AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - LARRY HOLLIDAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY; Entry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF AN ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: SPENCE, GEORGE RAY

    Read MoreRead Less