This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 03:46:46 (UTC).

SHIRLEY FRANKS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 SHIRLEY FRANKS -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-55

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Decedent

FRANKS, SHIRLEY HOLLAND

Not Yet Classified and Administrator

HOLLAND, DONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SMITH, THOMAS EARL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

01/24/2022: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

01/24/2022: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

01/24/2022: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

03/11/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

CONSENT

04/23/2022: CONSENT

CONSENT

04/23/2022: CONSENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CONSENT; Name: SMITH, THOMAS EARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CONSENT; Name: SMITH, THOMAS EARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: SMITH, THOMAS EARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Entry: Franks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: SMITH, THOMAS EARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: SMITH, THOMAS EARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 26CO3925.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SMITH, THOMAS EARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SMITH, THOMAS EARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: SMITH, THOMAS EARL

    Read MoreRead Less