This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 01/11/2022 at 14:55:05 (UTC).

SHERRI STEVENS V JAMES STEVENS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 SHERRI STEVENS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JAMES STEVENS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judges overseeing this case are WEBB and COPELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-456

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judges

WEBB

COPELAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEVENS, SHERRI LYNN

EARLS, SHERRI LYNN

Defendants

JAMES, STEVENS D

STEVENS, JAMES D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAYLESS, PAUL ALLEN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

11/13/2020: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

WAIVER

12/01/2020: WAIVER

PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

12/01/2020: PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

DEPOSITION

01/21/2021: DEPOSITION

DEPOSITION

01/21/2021: DEPOSITION

DEPOSITION

01/21/2021: DEPOSITION

DECREE OF DIVORCE

02/08/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: BAYLESS, PAUL ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: BAYLESS, PAUL ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: BAYLESS, PAUL ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: BAYLESS, PAUL ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Name: BAYLESS, PAUL ALLEN; Entry: SEPARATION AND PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: BAYLESS, PAUL ALLEN; Entry: WAIVER AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 03CI4725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: BAYLESS, PAUL ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: BAYLESS, PAUL ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: BAYLESS, PAUL ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less