This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/21/2023 at 05:42:27 (UTC).

SHAWN STURKEY V LOLITA STURKEY -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 SHAWN STURKEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LOLITA STURKEY -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-110

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STURKEY, SHAWN TIMOTHY

STURKEY, SHAWN

Defendant

STURKEY, LOLITA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/14/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

02/14/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

02/14/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

LETTER FROM COURT

02/16/2022: LETTER FROM COURT

MOTION DISMISS

03/15/2022: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

04/11/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: STURKEY, SHAWN TIMOTHY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING SCHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER FROM COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less