This case was last updated from Van Buren County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 09:53:33 (UTC).

SHARON TALIAFERRO V UNITED SERVICES ETAL -JURY TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 SHARON TALIAFERRO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES ETAL -JURY TRIAL. This case was filed in Van Buren County Courts, Van Buren County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WEAVER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-52

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Van Buren, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WEAVER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TALIAFERRO, SHARON MELISSA

Defendants

YOUNG, TEAGAN RHIANNA

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARTNESS, MATTHEW EUGENE

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH, RICHARD ALLEN

LLOYD, JAMES C

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

04/13/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

04/13/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

04/13/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ANSWER FILED

04/29/2021: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER FILED

05/03/2021: ANSWER FILED

AMENDED COMPLAINT

05/04/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER FILED

05/05/2021: ANSWER FILED

AMENDED ANSWER

05/06/2021: AMENDED ANSWER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/06/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/06/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: HARTNESS, MATTHEW EUGENE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: HARTNESS, MATTHEW EUGENE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED ANSWER; Name: LLOYD, JAMES C; Entry: AMENDED ANSWER SEPARATE DEFENDANT, TEAGAN YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: SMITH, RICHARD ALLEN; Entry: ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED COMPLAINT; Name: HARTNESS, MATTHEW EUGENE; Entry: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: SMITH, RICHARD ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: SMITH, RICHARD ALLEN; Entry: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: LLOYD, JAMES C; Entry: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 71CI3309.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: HARTNESS, MATTHEW EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: HARTNESS, MATTHEW EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: HARTNESS, MATTHEW EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: HARTNESS, MATTHEW EUGENE; Entry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: HARTNESS, MATTHEW EUGENE; Entry: COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less