This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 12/27/2022 at 11:03:30 (UTC).

SHANE LENARDT V ASHLEY LENARDT -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 SHANE LENARDT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ASHLEY LENARDT -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCAIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-346

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MCCAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LENARDT, SHANE M

Defendant

LENARDT, ASHLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

07/07/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

07/07/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

08/15/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

08/15/2022: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

08/17/2022: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

08/29/2022: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

AFFIDAVIT FILED

09/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

09/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

09/21/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

DECREE OF DIVORCE

10/06/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY AND CORROBORATION OF GROUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS; Entry: AFFIDAVIT ORAL DISPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, SHANE M. LENARDT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: RE: HEARING ON 10/06/22 @ 11:30 AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK; Entry: ISSUED TO ASHLEY LENARDT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF WARNING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 58CI2785.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less