This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 03/28/2022 at 09:24:27 (UTC).

SERENA YOUNG V GRADY YOUNG JR -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 SERENA YOUNG filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GRADY YOUNG JR -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is OHM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-324

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

OHM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG, SERENA DAWN

Defendant

YOUNG, GRADY HUGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

ABERNATHY, LESLIE BRETT

ETHRIDGE, CHRISTOPHER SHANE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

04/23/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

06/01/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

RESPONSE/REPLY

06/07/2021: RESPONSE/REPLY

COUNTERCLAIM

06/07/2021: COUNTERCLAIM

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

07/19/2021: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

LETTER

09/28/2021: LETTER

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/21/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION CONTINUANCE

12/08/2021: MOTION CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: CUSTODY HEARING CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Entry: 12-9-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: CUSTODY HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Name: ABERNATHY, LESLIE BRETT; Entry: REQUEST FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: ABERNATHY, LESLIE BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: ETHRIDGE, CHRISTOPHER SHANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: ABERNATHY, LESLIE BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 26CI14428.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ABERNATHY, LESLIE BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ABERNATHY, LESLIE BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: ABERNATHY, LESLIE BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: ABERNATHY, LESLIE BRETT; Entry: GRADY YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: ABERNATHY, LESLIE BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: ABERNATHY, LESLIE BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less