This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 06:57:07 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC VS DAILY BALENTINE

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 SECOND ROUND SUB LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAILY BALENTINE. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CARNAHAN, CHRIS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-680

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CARNAHAN, CHRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC

Defendant

BALENTINE, DAILY DIANE

Conway, AR 72032-7111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER, RONALD C

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

07/14/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

07/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

RETURN SERVICE NON EST INVENT

08/10/2021: RETURN SERVICE NON EST INVENT

SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

09/22/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

10/20/2021: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME

10/29/2021: ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME

SERVICE (IN STATE)

12/17/2021: SERVICE (IN STATE)

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/05/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

04/26/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: SECOND ROUND SUB LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: SECOND ROUND SUB LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$45.00 was made on receipt 23CW72556.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Name: SECOND ROUND SUB LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SERVICE (IN STATE); Name: BALENTINE, DAILY DIANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME; Name: SECOND ROUND SUB LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: SECOND ROUND SUB LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$2.50 was made on receipt 23CW71142.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE; Name: SECOND ROUND SUB LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN SERVICE NON EST INVENT; Name: BALENTINE, DAILY DIANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$82.50 was made on receipt 23CW70193.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE; Name: SECOND ROUND SUB LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: SECOND ROUND SUB LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less