This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/21/2023 at 01:17:53 (UTC).

SEAN MITCHELL V MEGAN MITCHELL -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 SEAN MITCHELL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEGAN MITCHELL -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-94

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MITCHELL, SEAN

Defendant

MITCHELL, MEGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROOK, KEVIN DALE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/09/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

02/09/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

AFFIDAVIT FILED

03/23/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

03/23/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

ORDER OTHER

03/23/2022: ORDER OTHER

ORDER OTHER

05/03/2022: ORDER OTHER

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/01/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT FILED

07/17/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

07/17/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

FILING - OTHER

07/20/2022: FILING - OTHER

DECREE OF DIVORCE

07/29/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: ROOK, KEVIN DALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: ROOK, KEVIN DALE; Entry: Plaintiff's Witness's Affidavit of Facts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: ROOK, KEVIN DALE; Entry: Plaintiff's Affidavit of Facts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: ROOK, KEVIN DALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: WARNING ORDER - MEGAN MITCHELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: ROOK, KEVIN DALE; Entry: Plaintiff's Attorney's Affidavit for Warning Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: ROOK, KEVIN DALE; Entry: Plaintiff's Affidavit for Warning Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less