This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 01/29/2023 at 17:17:37 (UTC).

SCHELLER V DANKS -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 SCHELLER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DANKS -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, JOHN R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1481

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, JOHN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHELLER, RACHEL

Defendant

DANKS, SKYLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARRETT, EARL J.

Defendant Attorney

HATFIELD, ANDREW HUNTER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ANSWER FILED

09/16/2022: ANSWER FILED

COUNTERCLAIM

09/16/2022: COUNTERCLAIM

NOTICE TRIAL SCHEDULED

09/19/2022: NOTICE TRIAL SCHEDULED

ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING

09/21/2022: ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

10/20/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

TEMPORARY ORDER

10/26/2022: TEMPORARY ORDER

TEMPORARY ORDER

10/26/2022: TEMPORARY ORDER

DECREE OF DIVORCE

01/19/2023: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: CUSTODY SUPPORT INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: PLF TO HAVE CUSTODY DEF TO HAVE VISITATION AND PAY CONT CHILD SUPPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: GARRETT, EARL J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY ORDER; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: DEF TO PAY TEMPORARY CHILD SUPPORT; HEARING SET ON 1/19/2023 AT 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: GARRETT, EARL J.; Entry: ANSWER TO DEF COUNTERCLAIM FOR DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: 10/26/2022 AT 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE TRIAL SCHEDULED; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: TRIAL SET ON 1/19/2023 AT 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COUNTERCLAIM; Name: HATFIELD, ANDREW HUNTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: HATFIELD, ANDREW HUNTER; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: HATFIELD, ANDREW HUNTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 04CI82426.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: GARRETT, EARL J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: GARRETT, EARL J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: GARRETT, EARL J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less