This case was last updated from Craighead County Courts on 08/14/2022 at 11:13:15 (UTC).

SAVEN HAVEN SECURITY V DAMEON HILL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 SAVEN HAVEN SECURITY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAMEON HILL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Craighead County Courts, Craighead County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2-94

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Craighead, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFE HAVEN SECURITY INC

Defendant

HILL, DAMEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITTRO, CHASTITY CLARK

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/19/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

EXHIBITS

01/19/2022: EXHIBITS

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/20/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

02/27/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

MOTION DISMISS

05/17/2022: MOTION DISMISS

JUDGMENT-DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE

05/20/2022: JUDGMENT-DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Name: SAFE HAVEN SECURITY INC,; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: FITTRO, CHASTITY CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE; Name: 2ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 9,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: FITTRO, CHASTITY CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.; Name: FITTRO, CHASTITY CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 16ZS16396.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SAFE HAVEN SECURITY INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: FITTRO, CHASTITY CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: FITTRO, CHASTITY CLARK; Entry: EXHIBITS A & B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: FITTRO, CHASTITY CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: FITTRO, CHASTITY CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less