This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/21/2023 at 03:37:12 (UTC).

SAMANTHA BRANNON V DAKOTA BRANNON -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 SAMANTHA BRANNON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DAKOTA BRANNON -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-108

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANNON, SAMANTHA

Defendant

BRANNON, DAKOTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETTY, JAMES MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/11/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

02/11/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/14/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

03/22/2022: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

03/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

WAIVER

04/25/2022: WAIVER

DECREE OF DIVORCE

04/26/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: PETTY, JAMES MICHAEL; Entry: Waiver of Entry of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: PETTY, JAMES MICHAEL; Entry: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Name: PETTY, JAMES MICHAEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY HEARING SCHEDULED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Name: PETTY, JAMES MICHAEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less