This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 01/29/2023 at 12:29:54 (UTC).

RONALD STEITLER V AMY NORWOOD -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 RONALD STEITLER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AMY NORWOOD -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-438

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEITLER, RONALD LYNN

Defendant

NORWOOD, AMY MICHELE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIPSON, TORIE STEITLER

Defendant Attorney

TIDWELL, BRUCE B

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/12/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/12/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME

09/28/2022: ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME

RETURN OF SERVICE

09/28/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

MOTION DISMISS

10/11/2022: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

10/12/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: GIPSON, TORIE STEITLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Entry: WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: GIPSON, TORIE STEITLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: GIPSON, TORIE STEITLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME; Name: EIGHT SOUTH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: TIDWELL, BRUCE B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 46CI47462.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: GIPSON, TORIE STEITLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: GIPSON, TORIE STEITLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: GIPSON, TORIE STEITLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: GIPSON, TORIE STEITLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: GIPSON, TORIE STEITLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less