This case was last updated from Boone County Arkansas Courts on 12/30/2022 at 18:04:19 (UTC).

RON KIEFER V STEVE & TRACY OLIGER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 RON KIEFER filed an Other lawsuit against STEVE TRACY OLIGER -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Boone County Arkansas Courts, Boone County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is COPELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-249

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Boone, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

COPELAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE RONNIE J. KIEFER FAMILY TRUST DATED JANUARY 12, 2022

KIEFER, RON J.

Defendants

OLIGER, TRACY

OLIGER, STEVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEYER, WESTIN ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

08/30/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

08/31/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

08/31/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ANSWER FILED

09/07/2022: ANSWER FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

09/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

09/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/31/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/31/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER FILED

11/14/2022: ANSWER FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Entry: TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MEYER, WESTIN ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MEYER, WESTIN ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Name: MEYER, WESTIN ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 05CI4265.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MEYER, WESTIN ELIZABETH; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE - STEVE OLIGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MEYER, WESTIN ELIZABETH; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE - TRACY OLIGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MEYER, WESTIN ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MEYER, WESTIN ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MEYER, WESTIN ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MEYER, WESTIN ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MEYER, WESTIN ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less