This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 04/01/2022 at 01:18:31 (UTC).

RODRIGO TORRES CAMACHO V LESLIE ALEJANDRA CAMACHO -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 RODRIGO TORRES CAMACHO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LESLIE ALEJANDRA CAMACHO -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DYER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-716

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DYER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMACHO, RODRIGO TORRES

CAMACHO, RODRIGO T

Defendant

CAMACHO, LESLIE ALEJANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELSAY, RONALD D

Defendant Attorney

HURST, JUSTIN BYRUM

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/02/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/03/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

WAIVER CORROBORATION OF GROUND

10/26/2021: WAIVER CORROBORATION OF GROUND

DEPOSITION

10/27/2021: DEPOSITION

PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

10/27/2021: PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

DECREE OF DIVORCE

10/28/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION II,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: KELSAY, RONALD D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Name: KELSAY, RONALD D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: KELSAY, RONALD D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: HURST, JUSTIN BYRUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER CORROBORATION OF GROUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Name: CAMACHO, LESLIE ALEJANDRA; Entry: LESLIE ALEJANDRA CAMACHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 26CI15760.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: KELSAY, RONALD D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: KELSAY, RONALD D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: KELSAY, RONALD D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: KELSAY, RONALD D

    Read MoreRead Less